Navaratne, Navaratne Kumarannehelage Pradeep Sujeewa (CPSO#: 84835)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Dec 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Sinhalese

Education:University of Colombo, 1996

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 101
2318 Lake shore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8V 1B5
Phone: (416) 252-4440
Fax: (416) 252-4433
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pradeep Navaratne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 19 2009

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Navaratne ( CPSO# 84835 )

Business Address:
101 - 2318 Lakeshore Boulevard West
Toronto ON  M8V 1B5
Phone Number: (416) 252-4440

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 22 Dec 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NAVARATNE KUMARANNEHELAGE PRADEEP SUJEEWA NAVARATNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NAVARATNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 25 Aug 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 26 Aug 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 31 Dec 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Dec 2008