Neira Aragon, Victor Manuel (CPSO#: 83994)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Sep 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Sep 2008

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Spanish

Education:Pontificia Universidad Javeriana, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anesthesiology
Dalhousie University
Infirmary Hospital
1799 Robie St
Halifax NS  B3H 3A7
Phone: 9024734326
Fax: 9024239454
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1276 South Park Street
QE II Health Sciences Centre.
Victoria General Site.
Halifax NS  B3H 2Y9
Canada
Phone: 9024737736
County: 
Electoral District: 
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: V. Neira Aragon Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Mar 16 2016

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nova Scotia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 01 Sep 2008 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2006 to 01 Mar 2006
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 02 Mar 2006 to 30 Jun 2006
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2007 to 15 Sep 2007
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Ottawa, 16 Sep 2007 to 31 Aug 2008
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 13 Jan 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Aug 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2008
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 18 Nov 2010
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Nov 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 12 Nov 2015 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.   Victor  Manuel  Neira  Aragon  may  practise  medicine  independently  in
            paediatric anaesthesia.