Neu, Bernd Rainer (CPSO#: 29437)

Current Status: Active Member as of 15 Jul 1977

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 15 Jul 1977

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, German

Education:Dalhousie University, 1976

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
One Medical Place
20 Wynford Drive
Suite 319
Toronto ON  M3C 1J4
Phone: (416) 447-6176
Fax: (416) 447-5750
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Bernd Neu Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 21 2005

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Neu ( CPSO# 29437 )

Business Address:
One Medical Place
319 - 20 Wynford Drive
North York ON  M3C 1J4
Phone Number: (416) 447-6176

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
North York General Hospital,Branson Hospital Site Toronto
North York General Hospital,General Division Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Plastic Surgery Effective: 29 Nov 1982 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BERND RAINER NEU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NEU is educated and experienced.

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Jun 1976
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jun 1977
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 15 Jul 1977