Nicholson, Donna Jane (CPSO#: 78028)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Mar 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Division of Cardiac Anaesthesiology
Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street H213
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone: (613) 6967381
Fax: (613) 6967099
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Donna Nicholson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 25 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nicholson ( CPSO# 78028 )

Business Address:
Division of Cardiac Anaesthesiology
Univ of Ottawa Heart Institute
40 Ruskin Street H213
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4W7
Phone Number: (613) 761-4379

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 28 Jul 2000 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DONNA JANE NICHOLSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICHOLSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Mar 2003