Nicolici, Diana Felicia (CPSO#: 89063)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Nov 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:Institute Medicine, Pharmacy,Timisoara, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone: (905) 813-2398
Fax: (905) 813-4284
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Nicolici Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 21 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nicolici ( CPSO# 89063 )

Business Address:
Trillium Health Partners
Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-2398

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners,Queensway Health Centre Toronto
Trillium Health Partners,The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Psychiatry Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Psychiatry Effective: 31 Dec 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA FELICIA NICOLICI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICOLICI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 22 Sep 2008
Assessment Verification Period - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 6 - Geriatric Psychiatry

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 7 - Geriatric Psychiatry

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Nov 2014