Nicula, Mihaela (CPSO#: 75275)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Romanian

Education:University of Bucharest, 1997

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
West Park Healthcare Centre
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone: (416) 243-3600 Ext. 4211
Fax: (416) 243-3907
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nicula Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 12 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Nicula ( CPSO# 75275 )

Business Address:
82 Buttonwood Avenue
Toronto ON  M6M 2J5
Phone Number: (416) 243-3600

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
West Park Healthcare Centre Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist
Geriatric Medicine Effective: 23 Sep 2005 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MIHAELA NICULA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NICULA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Jul 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Geriatric Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004