Nikneshan, Davar (CPSO#: 90471)

Current Status: Active Member as of 13 Apr 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 13 Apr 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:University of Tehran, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
5546 Portage Rd
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone: (905) 357-3644
Fax: (905) 357-9230
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Outpatient Clinics
William Osler Health System
Brampton Civic Hospital
2100 Bovaird Dr East
Brampton ON  L6R 3J7
Canada
Phone: (905) 494-2120
Fax: (905) 494-6620
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05

Stroke Prevention Clinic
Trillium Health Partners
Mississauga Hospital
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 1B8
Canada
Phone: (905) 848-7379
Fax: (905) 848-7669
County: Regional Municipality of Peel
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nikneshan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 21 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Nikneshan ( CPSO# 90471 )

Business Address:
Niagara Health System
5546 Portage Road
Niagara Falls ON  L2E 6X2
Phone Number: (905) 357-3644

Business Address:
100 Queensway West
Mississauga ON  L5B 2V2
Phone Number: (905) 848-7379

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Niagara Health System Greater Niagara Site Niagara Falls
Niagara Health System Ontario Street Site St Catharines
Trillium Health Partners,Mississauga Hospital Mississauga
William Osler Health Centre Etobicoke General Site Toronto
William Osler Health Centre-Brampton Civic Hospital Brampton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Neurology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVAR NIKNESHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NIKNESHAN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 22 Sep 2009
Assessment Verification Period - Neurology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Neurology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Neurology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Apr 2015