Nofech-Mozes, Yehuda (CPSO#: 77775)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 May 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 May 2006

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Hebrew

Education:Tel Aviv University, 1995

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Scarborough Rouge Centenary Site
Department of Paediatrics
2867 Ellesmere Road
Toronto ON  M1E 4B9
Phone: (416) 281-7234
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. S. Nofech-Mozes Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 25 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. Y. Nofech-Mozes ( CPSO# 77775 )
Dr. S. Nofech-Mozes ( CPSO# 83611 )

Business Address:
Sunnybrook Health Sciences Centre
Department of Anatomical Pathology
2075 Bayview Avenue Room E4 23C
Toronto ON  M4N 3M5
Phone Number: (416) 480-6100

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Israel

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Rouge Valley Centenary Health Centre,Toronto Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 01 May 2006 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Paediatric Clinical Immunology and Allergy

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 May 2006
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 30 Jun 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Apr 2013
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Effective: 30 Oct 2014
Expiry date removed from certificate of registration. Effective: 16 Oct 2014

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 16 Oct 2014 Active View Details [+]
            Dr. Yehuda Nofech-Mozes may practise medicine independently in paediatrics,
            only.