Noordeh, Nima (CPSO#: 93470)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, Farsi

Education:St George's University of Grenada, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Prism Eye Institute
7700 Hurontario St. Unit 605
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone: 905-456-3937
Fax: 905-459-5085
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Medical Eye Consultants
16945 Leslie St. Unit 44
Newmarket ON  L3Y 9A2
Canada
Phone: 905-235-8055
Fax: 855-203-1060
County: Regional Municipality of York
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nima Noordeh Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 31 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Noordeh ( CPSO# 93470 )

Business Address:
Prism Eye Institute
7700 Hurontario Street
Unit 605
Brampton ON  L6Y 4M3
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
16945 Leslie Street
Suite 44
Newmarket ON  L3Y 9A2
Phone Number: (905) 235-8055

Business Address:
1 - 3200 Erin Mills Parkway
Mississauga ON  L5L 1W8
Phone Number: (905) 456-3937

Business Address:
410 - 955 Major Mackenzie Drive West
Richmond Hill ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 963-1717

Business Address:
230 - 1101 Kingston Road
Pickering ON  L1V 1B5
Phone Number: (289) 624-1789

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2015 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NIMA NOORDEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NOORDEH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 27 Sep 2010
Assessment Verification Period - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 28 Sep 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2014 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2015 to 30 Jun 2016
Clinical Fellow - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Sep 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2015