Nurae, Khalid Ahmed (CPSO#: 85237)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Aug 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Aug 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: Amharic, English

Education:Jimma University, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Unit 103b
3335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 1S8
Phone: (519) 250-6934
Fax: (519) 250-6719
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khalid Nurae Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 18 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nurae ( CPSO# 85237 )

Business Address:
103B-3335 Dougall Avenue
Windsor ON  N9E 1S8
Phone Number: (519) 250-6934

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHALID AHMED NURAE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NURAE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Aug 2008