Nuri, Khuloud Fahmi Khaled (CPSO#: 87950)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2008

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Sep 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English

Education:University of Al Fateh, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
CAMBRIDGE MEMORIAL HOSPITAL
700 CORONATION BLVD
CAMBRIDGE, ON
N1R 3G2
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone: (519) 621-2333 Ext. 2349
Fax: (519) 740-4905
Electoral District: 03
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Zabtia & Nuri Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 30 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Nuri ( CPSO# 87950 )
Dr. N. Zabtia ( CPSO# 80717 )

Business Address:
Cambridge Memorial Hospital
700 Coronation Boulevard
Cambridge ON  N1R 3G2
Phone Number: (519) 621-2333

Business Address:
3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville ON  L6M 0L8
Phone Number: (905) 845-2571

Business Address:
3075 Hospital Gate
Suite 221
Oakville ON  L6L 1M1

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Cambridge Memorial Hospital Cambridge

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Medical Microbiology Effective: 18 Sep 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KHULOUD FAHMI KHALED NURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. NURI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jan 2008 to 20 Mar 2008
PEAP - Resident - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2008 to 20 Mar 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2009 to 20 Mar 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2010 to 20 Mar 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 21 Mar 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 18 Sep 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 19 Sep 2011 to 18 Sep 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 19 Sep 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 18 Sep 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Medical Microbiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 21 Mar 2008
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Sep 2013