O'Connor, David Jonathan (CPSO#: 90572)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 27 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: Beaver, David Jonathan (used until: 09 Aug 2017 )

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Whangarei Hospital
Maunu Rd
Whangarei 0112
New Zealand
Phone: 64094304100
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: David Beaver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 2 2017

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia
New Zealand

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 24 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 19 Oct 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID JONATHAN O'CONNOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'CONNOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 27 Jun 2011