O'Kelly, Kevin Francis (CPSO#: 60388)

Current Status: Active Member as of 06 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 06 Jul 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:National University of Ireland, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78212
Fax: (613) 737-8957
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Ottawa Hospital General Campus
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Canada
Phone: (613) 737-8899 Ext. 78212
Fax: (613) 761-4476
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kevin O'Kelly Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 23 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. K. O'Kelly ( CPSO# 60388 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Department of Diagnostic Imaging
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9
Phone Number: (613) 737-8212

Business Address:
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 722-7000

Business Address:
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0
Phone Number: (613) 774-2420

Business Address:
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6
Phone Number: (613) 432-4891

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Nunavut

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 10 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KEVIN FRANCIS O'KELLY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'KELLY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 10 Oct 1988 to 30 Jun 1989
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 1988
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1989
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 06 Jul 2006