O'Toole, Danielle Marie (CPSO#: 93527)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: Jarecki, Danielle Marie (used until: 17 Jan 2011 )

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
3rd floor
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 546-9885
Fax: 905-972-8903
Electoral District: 04
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

70 Macklin Street North
Hamilton ON  L8S 3S1
Canada
Phone: (905) 529-1613
County: Regional Municipality of Hamilton-Wentworth
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Danielle O'Toole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 07 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. O'Toole ( CPSO# 93527 )

Business Address:
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 546-9885

Business Address:
70 Macklin Street North
Hamilton ON  L8S 3S1
Phone Number: (905) 529-1613

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANIELLE MARIE O'TOOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'TOOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2012