O'Toole, Susan Ann (CPSO#: 73582)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
460 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W6
Phone: (705) 444-5533
Fax: (844) 237-0088
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Susan A. O'Toole Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 15 2010

Shareholders:
Dr. S. O'Toole ( CPSO# 73582 )

Business Address:
460 Hume Street
Collingwood ON  L9Y 1W6
Phone Number: (705) 444-5533

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Collingwood General and Marine Hospital Collingwood

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUSAN ANN O'TOOLE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. O'TOOLE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004