Odorcic, Silvia (CPSO#: 91486)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Croatian, English

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 316
2115 Finch Ave West
Toronto ON  M3N 2V6
Phone: 416-745-6969
Fax: 416-745-6724
Electoral District: 10
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Suite 305
500 Sheppard Avenue East
Toronto ON  M2N 6H7
Canada
Phone: (416) 221-2093
County: City of Toronto
Electoral District: 10

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Ophthalmology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SILVIA ODORCIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ODORCIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Ophthalmology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Ophthalmology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015