Okrainec, Karen (CPSO#: 97430)

Current Status: Active Member as of 04 Jun 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 07 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
399 Bathurst Street
8 E Wing- 408
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone: (416) 603-5800 Ext. 2141
Fax: 416-603-6495
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Karen Okrainec Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2017

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Okrainec ( CPSO# 97430 )

Business Address:
Toronto Western Hospital
Department of Internal Medicine
8 East Wing - 408
399 Bathurst Street
Toronto ON  M5T 2S8
Phone Number: (416) 603-5800

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mount Sinai Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto Western Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2011 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KAREN OKRAINEC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OKRAINEC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 16 Apr 2012 to 04 May 2012
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 04 Jun 2012 to 29 Jun 2012
Elective Trainee - Internal Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Apr 2012
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 May 2012
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jun 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jun 2012