Olah, Michael Joseph (CPSO#: 84822)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 23 Jun 2008

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Charles Univ Prague, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6 Beamish Drive
Toronto ON  M9B 3P3
Phone: (416) 239-2305
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: M. Olah Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Oct 14 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Olah ( CPSO# 84822 )
Dr. M. Olah ( CPSO# 78764 )

Business Address:
6 Beamish Drive
Toronto ON  M9B 3P3
Phone Number: (416) 239-2305

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2008 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL JOSEPH OLAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLAH is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2006 to 23 Sep 2006
Assessment Verification Period - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 24 Sep 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2006
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Jun 2008