Oliver, Douglas Mark (CPSO#: 76089)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Jun 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone: (905) 546-9885
Fax: (905) 972-8903
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Douglas M. Oliver Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 23 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Oliver ( CPSO# 76089 )

Business Address:
301-100 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8P 1H6
Phone Number: (905) 546-9885

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DOUGLAS MARK OLIVER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OLIVER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 17 Jul 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Jun 2003