Ott, Michael Colin (CPSO#: 76351)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Feb 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Feb 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
LHSC- Victoria Hospital
Suite E2-211
800 Commissioners Road East
P.O. Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8260
Fax: (519) 685-8378
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Ott Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 02 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ott ( CPSO# 76351 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
Box 5010
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8260

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL COLIN OTT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OTT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Feb 2007