Owen, Diana Clare (CPSO#: 76253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 10 Jul 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Montfort Hospital
Emergency Department
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone: (613) 746-4621 Ext. 4212
Fax: (613) 748-4971
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Rd
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Canada
Phone: (705) 759-3434
Fax: (705) 759-3708
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Diana Owen Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 10 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Owen ( CPSO# 76253 )

Business Address:
Monfort Hospital
713 Montreal Road
Ottawa ON  K1K 0T2
Phone Number: (613) 746-4621

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Montfort Hospital Ottawa
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 23 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 17 Dec 2004 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DIANA CLARE OWEN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWEN is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Jul 2003