Ower, Katherine Mary (CPSO#: 73462)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2004

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Alberta, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Anaesthesia
London Health Sciences Centre
Victoria Campus
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8525
Fax: (519) 685-8275
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Katherine Ower Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. K. Ower ( CPSO# 73462 )

Business Address:
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Business Address:
St. Joseph's Health Centre
Dept. of Anaesthesia
A1 - 102
268 Grosvenor Street
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 646-6019

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London
London Health Sciences Centre,University Site London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 30 Jun 2004 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. KATHERINE MARY OWER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OWER is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2004