De Maio, Peter Nicholas (CPSO#: 86122)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Sydney, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Suite 216
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone: (289) 553-5040
Fax: (289) 553-5042
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Partap Law Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 13 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. P. De Maio ( CPSO# 86122 )
Dr. F. Budhani ( CPSO# 86329 )
Dr. R. Chan ( CPSO# 69076 )
Dr. P. Buckler ( CPSO# 79394 )
Dr. R. Cameron ( CPSO# 50334 )
Dr. R. Graham ( CPSO# 30863 )
Dr. R. Hany ( CPSO# 54238 )
Dr. G. Hochman ( CPSO# 33401 )
Dr. S. Isaacson ( CPSO# 55070 )
Dr. N. Just ( CPSO# 70679 )
Dr. N. Langhorne ( CPSO# 68045 )
Dr. F. Lan ( CPSO# 72316 )
Dr. P. Law ( CPSO# 69001 )
Dr. J. McKee ( CPSO# 33512 )
Dr. V. Partap ( CPSO# 74251 )
Dr. M. Rooney ( CPSO# 51506 )
Dr. Y. Siow ( CPSO# 66696 )
Dr. E. Silmberg ( CPSO# 71544 )
Dr. P. Stroz ( CPSO# 59469 )
Dr. L. Thain ( CPSO# 59614 )
Dr. D. Boparai ( CPSO# 81452 )
Dr. B. Yeung ( CPSO# 77885 )
Dr. P. Zia ( CPSO# 71413 )

Business Address:
B02 - 250 Harding Boulevard West
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 9M7
Phone Number: (905) 737-0595

Business Address:
104 - 679 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 5G8
Phone Number: (905) 895-1313

Business Address:
Southlake Regional Health Centre
596 Davis Drive
Newmarket ON  L3Y 2P9
Phone Number: (905) 895-4521

Business Address:
Mackenzie Richmond Hill Hospital
10 Trench Street
Richmond Hill ON  L4C 4Z3
Phone Number: (905) 883-1212

Business Address:
Suite 102
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-6336

Business Address:
Unit 3, 4, 5
125 Pedersen Drive
Aurora ON  L4G 0E3


Corporation Name: De Maio Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 30 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. P. De Maio ( CPSO# 86122 )

Business Address:
955 Major Mackenzie Drive
Suite 216
Vaughan ON  L6A 4P9
Phone Number: (289) 553-5040

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Mackenzie Health,Richmond Hill Richmond Hill
Southlake Regional Health Centre Newmarket

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. PETER NICHOLAS DE MAIO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MAIO is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 22 Sep 2007
Assessment Verification Period - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 23 Sep 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 4 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 5 - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 23 Sep 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2012

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: November 18, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a Specified Continuing Education and Remediation Program (“SCERP”) is required by the College By-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A SCERP is one of the dispositions that the College’s Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee may make in connection with a matter before it, and this disposition requires the member to complete an education and remediation program specified for the member. A note will also be posted when all the elements of the SCERP have been completed. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a SCERP:

NOTE: This decision has been appealed to the Health Professions Appeal and Review Board.
Download Full Document (PDF)