Pagtakhan, Arlene Laiz (CPSO#: 65698)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 10 Aug 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 10 Aug 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1987

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Arlene Pagtakhan Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Oct 30 2018

Medical Records Location

Address: RSRS 111 St Regis Cres S Toronto ON M3J 1Y8
Date Received: 10 May 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jun 1992 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 1992
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 10 Aug 2018