Pai, Menaka (CPSO#: 79079)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 17 Aug 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:McMaster University, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Hamilton General Hospital
Room 1 270A
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone: (905) 521-2100 Ext. 46139
Fax: (905) 577-1421
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Menaka Pai Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 17 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Pai ( CPSO# 79079 )

Business Address:
Hamilton General Hospital
1 270A - 237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences Centre McMaster & Childrens Hosp,McMaster & Children's Hospital Hamilton
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Internal Medicine Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist
Hematology Effective: 17 Sep 2008 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MENAKA PAI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAI is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 1 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 2 - Internal Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 3 - Internal Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 4 - Hematology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 5 - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Hematology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2003
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Aug 2007