Palma, David Anthony (CPSO#: 82253)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 May 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 May 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre A3-12
800 Commissioners Rd. E.
P.O. Box 5010, STN B
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8600
Fax: (519) 685-8614
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Smits Palma Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 29 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Palma ( CPSO# 82253 )
Dr. C. Smits ( CPSO# 90411 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
190 Wortley Road
London ON  N6C 4Y7
Phone Number: (519) 438-5101

Business Address:
London Regional Cancer Centre
Department of Radiation Oncology
790 Commissioners Road East
Room A3-123B
London ON  N6A 4L6
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre Victoria Hospital London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Radiation Oncology Effective: 30 Jun 2009 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID ANTHONY PALMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PALMA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Mar 2005 to 08 Apr 2005
Elective Trainee - Emergency Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Oct 2008 to 31 Oct 2008
Elective Trainee - Radiation Oncology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 14 Mar 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 08 Apr 2005
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Oct 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2010