Pang, Wei-Hsi (CPSO#: 73444)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1999

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 22 Jun 2001

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 1999

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Courtice Health Centre
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone: (905) 721-3520
Fax: (905) 721-6645
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Canada
Phone: (905) 723-8551
Fax: (905) 721-6645
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: W. H. Pang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 13 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. W. Pang ( CPSO# 73444 )

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Business Address:
1450 Highway 2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Business Address:
1290 Keith Ross Drive
Oshawa ON  L1H 7K4
Phone Number: (905) 723-8551

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2001 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. WEI-HSI PANG may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PANG is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1999
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jun 2001