Parsons-Sheldrake, Jeffrey Richard (CPSO#: 74957)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2000

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jul 2002

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:University of Ottawa, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone: (705) 653-1140
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Parsons-Sheldrake Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 20 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Parsons-Sheldrake ( CPSO# 74957 )

Business Address:
Campbellford Memorial Hospital
146 Oliver Road
Campbellford ON  K0L 1L0
Phone Number: (705) 653-1140

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2002 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JEFFREY RICHARD PARSONS-SHELDRAKE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARSONS-SHELDRAKE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Aug 2002
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2000
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jul 2002

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: March 21, 2018
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)