Partridge, Lindsay Anne Frances (CPSO#: 90991)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jun 2011

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
6206 Perth Street
Richmond ON  K0A2Z0
Phone: 6138382093
Fax: 6138382152
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Lindsay Partridge Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 28 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Partridge ( CPSO# 90991 )

Business Address:
Richmond Goulburn Medical Centre
6206 Perth Street
Box 370
Richmond ON  K0A 2Z0
Phone Number: (613) 838-2093

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Clinton Public Hospital Clinton
Geraldton District Hospital Geraldton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 27 Jun 2011 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSAY ANNE FRANCES PARTRIDGE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PARTRIDGE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2011