Parveen, Kazi Shahnaz (CPSO#: 96553)

Current Status: Expired: Committee terms and conditions as of 02 Apr 2016

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 02 Apr 2016

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Chittagong, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Parveen-Quayyum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Nov 5 2015


Corporation Name: Dr. Parveen-Quayyum Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Jan 6 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2011
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 14 Jul 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Feb 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 19 Jun 2014
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Jul 2015
Terms and conditions amended by member Effective: 16 Feb 2016
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Apr 2016

Concerns

Source: Member
Active Date: February 16, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Summary of the Undertaking given by Dr. Kazi Shahnaz Parveen to the College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario, effective February 16, 2016:

Dr. Parveen was the subject of a College investigation into whether he engaged in professional misconduct and/or is incompetent in her family practice. As a result of the investigation:

• Dr. Parveen shall see patients no more than six (6) hours per day, and shall see no more than thirty (30) patients within the 6 hour work day.

• Dr. Parveen will practise under the guidance of a Clinical Supervisor acceptable to the College for twelve (12) months.

• Dr. Parveen will engage in professional education.

• Dr. Parveen’s practice will be reassessed by an assessor selected by the College within six (6) months of the end of the period of Clinical Supervision.