Pastolero, Gemma Coronel (CPSO#: 64808)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 13 Jun 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 13 Jun 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Filipino

Education:University of the Philippines, 1979

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pastolero Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 12 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. G. Pastolero ( CPSO# 64808 )

Business Address:
2200 Eglinton Avenue West
Mississauga ON  L5M 2N1
Phone Number: (905) 813-1100

Business Address:
101 Humber College Boulevard
Etobicoke ON  M9V 2W7

Business Address:
100 International Boulevard
Toronto ON  M9Z 6L6
Phone Number: (416) 675-4530

Business Address:
1262 Don Mills Road
Toronto ON  M3B 2W7
Phone Number: (416) 747-3400

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Newfoundland and Labrador
USA - Indiana

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 06 Jun 1996 RCPSC Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1992 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 31 Dec 1992
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 1993 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 28 Jan 1994
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 29 Jan 1994 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 28 Jan 1995
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 29 Jan 1995 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1995 to 28 Jan 1996
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jan 1992
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 28 Jan 1996
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Jun 1996
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 13 Jun 2018