Patel, Nita G (CPSO#: 90863)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2014

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2014

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Gujarati

Education:University of Toronto, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone: (905) 875-2280
Fax: (905) 875-9172
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nita Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 29 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patel ( CPSO# 90863 )

Business Address:
Suite 208
311 Commercial Street
Milton ON  L9T 3Z9
Phone Number: (905) 875-2280

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Milton Site Halton Healthcare Services Milton
Royal Victoria Regional Health Centre Barrie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Obstetrics and Gynecology Effective: 30 Jun 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. NITA G PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - Obstetrics and Gynecology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2014