Patel, Sunil Vijay (CPSO#: 91460)

Current Status: Active Member as of 28 Jul 2015

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 28 Jul 2015

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Burr 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 7995
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sunil Patel Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 26 2015

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Patel ( CPSO# 91460 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
General Surgery Effective: 13 Jul 2014 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SUNIL VIJAY PATEL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATEL is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 13 Jul 2012
PostGrad Yr 3 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2013 to 13 Jul 2013
PostGrad Yr 4 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 14 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2014 to 13 Jul 2014
PostGrad Yr 5 - General Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 13 Jul 2014
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jul 2015