Patt, Norman Leon (CPSO#: 15413)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Sep 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Sep 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1955

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Norm Patt Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 10 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. N. Patt ( CPSO# 15413 )

Business Address:
220 Dundas Street East
Whitby ON  L1M 8M7
Phone Number: (905) 430-1781

Business Address:
Oshawa Clinic
117 King Street East
Oshawa ON  L1H 1B9
Phone Number: (905) 721-3522

Business Address:
1450 Highway #2
Courtice ON  L1E 3C3

Medical Records Location

Address: Oshawa Clinic 117 King St E Oshawa ON L1H 1B9 Tel: 905-721-4300
Date Received: 17 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 14 Nov 1962 RCPSC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Sep 1955
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Sep 2018