Patterson, Jennifer Kathryn (CPSO#: 91088)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2009

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 18 Jun 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Northern Ontario School Of Medicine, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone: (705) 759-1234
Electoral District: 08
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Canada
Phone: (705) 253-1313
County: Territorial District of Algoma
Electoral District: 08
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Fera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 27 2003

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Wytsma ( CPSO# 52032 )
Dr. D. Fera ( CPSO# 33299 )
Dr. M. Mathew ( CPSO# 44024 )
Dr. B. Mitchell ( CPSO# 59931 )
Dr. M. Edwards ( CPSO# 52889 )
Dr. C. Bruni ( CPSO# 55651 )
Dr. S. Bondar ( CPSO# 59698 )
Dr. M. Keating ( CPSO# 57489 )
Dr. M. Mogharrabi ( CPSO# 57473 )
Dr. S. Allen ( CPSO# 73014 )
Dr. P. Zehr ( CPSO# 59997 )
Dr. M. Hemy ( CPSO# 86777 )
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. L. Bonder ( CPSO# 90576 )
Dr. C. Kuntz ( CPSO# 84476 )
Dr. K. Taylor ( CPSO# 75094 )
Dr. H. Gupta ( CPSO# 78301 )
Dr. W. Wallace ( CPSO# 92960 )
Dr. M. Vance ( CPSO# 101038)
Dr. V. Coccimiglio ( CPSO# 101205)
Dr. P. Ciaschini ( CPSO# 52948 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )
Dr. B. Banks ( CPSO# 99188 )
Dr. J. Stewart ( CPSO# 72520 )
Dr. G. Yee ( CPSO# 70560 )
Dr. M. Wilson ( CPSO# 69274 )
Dr. M. Lee ( CPSO# 62320 )
Dr. M. Leahy ( CPSO# 57088 )
Dr. S. Buehner ( CPSO# 65582 )
Dr. C. Kobelka ( CPSO# 62567 )
Dr. A. Fam ( CPSO# 62586 )
Dr. M. Jenkins ( CPSO# 99889 )
Dr. J. Jonusaitis ( CPSO# 100796)
Dr. J. Bishop ( CPSO# 96910 )
Dr. B. Jarrett ( CPSO# 102167)
Dr. B. Slagel ( CPSO# 79472 )
Dr. D. Micomonaco ( CPSO# 80815 )
Dr. J. Keuhl ( CPSO# 88070 )
Dr. E. Hirvi ( CPSO# 84322 )
Dr. J. DellaVedova ( CPSO# 91071 )
Dr. K. Opryszczko ( CPSO# 89989 )
Dr. J. Lane ( CPSO# 61549 )
Dr. D. Fritz ( CPSO# 60812 )
Dr. A. Schamp ( CPSO# 82979 )
Dr. P. Bragaglia ( CPSO# 33769 )
Dr. M. Hackett ( CPSO# 33820 )
Dr. J. Reich ( CPSO# 73103 )
Dr. K. Zufelt ( CPSO# 67007 )
Dr. C. Rossi ( CPSO# 51523 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
170 East Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 3C6
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
955 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C3
Phone Number: (705) 549-5540

Business Address:
974 Queen Street East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 2C2
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540

Business Address:
773 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 5K7
Phone Number: (705) 759-5540


Corporation Name: Jennifer Kathryn Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 02 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 1Y5
Phone Number: (705) 253-1313


Corporation Name: Win Yan Chung Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 13 2013

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Patterson ( CPSO# 91088 )
Dr. W. Chung ( CPSO# 99567 )

Business Address:
733 Third Line East
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 7C1

Business Address:
240 McNabb Street
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6A 6J8
Phone Number: (705) 759-1234

Business Address:
Sault Area Hospital
750 Great Northern Road
Sault Ste Marie ON  P6B 0A8
Phone Number: (705) 759-3434

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Sault Area Hospital Sault Ste Marie

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 18 Jun 2012 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JENNIFER KATHRYN PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2010 to 31 Jan 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Feb 2011 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2011 to 05 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2009
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2012