Patterson, Lindsey Jane (CPSO#: 71791)

Current Status: Active Member as of 29 Nov 2006

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 29 Nov 2006

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Leeds, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Kingston General Hospital
Dept of Anesthesiology Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone: (613) 549-6666 Ext. 3591
Fax: (613) 548-1375
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Lindsey Patterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 19 2007

Shareholders:
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesia
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 549-6666


Corporation Name: Parlow Saha Wang Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Nov 26 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Henry ( CPSO# 63132 )
Dr. I. Gilron ( CPSO# 62229 )
Dr. D. Mark ( CPSO# 59595 )
Dr. L. Wang ( CPSO# 59429 )
Dr. J. Parlow ( CPSO# 53229 )
Dr. A. Ho ( CPSO# 52926 )
Dr. G. Sudhakaran Nair ( CPSO# 85923 )
Dr. M. Kahn ( CPSO# 85650 )
Dr. D. Sydor ( CPSO# 82811 )
Dr. M. McMullen ( CPSO# 79939 )
Dr. R. Tanzola ( CPSO# 76158 )
Dr. R. Allard ( CPSO# 85022 )
Dr. D. Engen ( CPSO# 73829 )
Dr. S. Duggan ( CPSO# 72631 )
Dr. V. Shyam ( CPSO# 81241 )
Dr. J. Erb ( CPSO# 79144 )
Dr. T. Saha ( CPSO# 78692 )
Dr. J. Murdoch ( CPSO# 78475 )
Dr. G. Klar ( CPSO# 111507)
Dr. C. Haley ( CPSO# 104664)
Dr. A. Mir Ghassemi ( CPSO# 95204 )
Dr. G. Mizubuti ( CPSO# 101768)
Dr. J. Dion ( CPSO# 88602 )
Dr. M. Cummings ( CPSO# 71070 )
Dr. I. Galvin ( CPSO# 91553 )
Dr. S. Ridi ( CPSO# 84478 )
Dr. J. Burjorjee ( CPSO# 73521 )
Dr. C. Reimer ( CPSO# 79239 )
Dr. R. Rooney ( CPSO# 78503 )
Dr. M. Fleming ( CPSO# 71251 )
Dr. L. Patterson ( CPSO# 71791 )
Dr. J. Van Vlymen ( CPSO# 62179 )
Dr. M. Jaeger ( CPSO# 64665 )
Dr. K. Turner ( CPSO# 55360 )
Dr. S. Haley ( CPSO# 50665 )

Business Address:
Kingston General Hospital
Department of Anaesthesiology
Victory 2
76 Stuart Street
Kingston ON  K7L 2V7
Phone Number: (613) 548-7827

Business Address:
Hotel Dieu Hospital
166 Brock Street
Kingston ON  K7L 5G2
Phone Number: (613) 544-3310

Business Address:
Providence Continuing Care Centre
752 King Street West
Kingston ON  K7L 4X3
Phone Number: (613) 546-1101

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Kingston Health Sciences Centre Kingston
Providence Care Hospital Kingston

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 02 Jun 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. LINDSEY JANE PATTERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PATTERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1997 to 30 Jun 1998
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Queen's University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 04 Jul 1997
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1999
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 02 Jul 1999
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 15 Jul 2002
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 16 Sep 2005
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 29 Nov 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Nov 2006