Paul, John Thomas (CPSO#: 82208)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 01 Jun 2017

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 01 Jun 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Georgetown University, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Practice Address Not Available
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: John Paul Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Inactive: Aug 16 2017

Medical Records Location

Address: Oshawa Clinic Business Office 117 King Street East Oshawa ON L1H 1B9
Date Received: 25 May 2017

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 17 Feb 2005
Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 17 Feb 2005
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry Date: 16 May 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 24 Mar 2006
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 09 Jun 2006
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2010
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 20 May 2010
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 01 Jun 2017