Payne, Michael William Charles (CPSO#: 77565)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2002

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 30 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:The University of Western Ontario, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Joseph's Health Care
Parkwood Institute
PO Box 5777 Stn B
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone: (519) 685-4000 Ext. 45027
Fax: (519) 685-4009
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Payne Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Aug 01 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Payne ( CPSO# 77565 )

Business Address:
Parkwood Institute
St Joseph's Healthcare
Stn B
P O Box 5777
London ON  N6A 4V2
Phone Number: (519) 685-4000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Joseph's Health Care,London - Parkwood Hospital London
St Joseph's Health Care-St Joseph's Site,London London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2007 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MICHAEL WILLIAM CHARLES PAYNE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PAYNE is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2005 to 30 Jun 2006
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2006 to 30 Jun 2007
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Aug 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
Clinical Fellow - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2002
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2007