Peacock, Sharon (CPSO#: 95344)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2011

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 01 Jul 2017

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Mount Sinai Hospital
600 University Ave
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone: 4165865270
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Sharon Peacock Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jun 18 2018

Shareholders:
Dr. S. Peacock ( CPSO# 95344 )

Business Address:
Mount Sinai Hospital
19 - 104
600 University Avenue
Toronto ON  M5G 1X5
Phone Number: (416) 586-5270

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anesthesiology Effective: 31 Dec 2016 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. SHARON PEACOCK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEACOCK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 1 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 2 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2013 to 30 Jun 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2014 to 31 Dec 2014
PostGrad Yr 3 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2015 to 30 Jun 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2015 to 31 Dec 2015
PostGrad Yr 4 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2016 to 30 Jun 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2016 to 31 Dec 2016
PostGrad Yr 5 - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2017 to 30 Jun 2017
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2017 to 30 Jun 2018
Clinical Fellow - Anesthesiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2011
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2017