Pecjak, Dana Christine (CPSO#: 88689)

Current Status: Active Member as of 14 Aug 2013

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 14 Aug 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone: (613) 721-2000 Ext. 4500
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Pecjak Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jul 23 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Pecjak ( CPSO# 88689 )

Business Address:
Queensway Carleton Hospital
3045 Baseline Road
Ottawa ON  K2H 8P4
Phone Number: (613) 721-2000

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Queensway Carleton Hospital Ottawa

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation Effective: 30 Jun 2013 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DANA CHRISTINE PECJAK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PECJAK is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 1 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 2 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 3 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 4 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2008
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2013
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 Aug 2013