Peebles, Erin Rachelle (CPSO#: 92042)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 May 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Ottawa, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
London Health Sciences Centre
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone: (519) 685-8500 Ext. 56075
Electoral District: 02
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Peebles Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  May 04 2016

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Peebles ( CPSO# 92042 )

Business Address:
London Health Sciences-Children's Hospital
Department of Pediatrics
800 Commissioners Road East
Room B1-137
London ON  N6A 5W9
Phone Number: (519) 685-8500

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
London Health Sciences Centre,Children's Hospital of Western Ontario London

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 30 Jun 2012 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. ERIN RACHELLE PEEBLES may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PEEBLES is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 31 Aug 2009 to 25 Sep 2009
Elective Trainee - Pediatrics

University of Ottawa, 07 Mar 2011 to 04 Apr 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

University of Toronto, 26 Sep 2011 to 23 Oct 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Critical Care

McMaster University, 24 Oct 2011 to 18 Nov 2011
Elective Trainee - Paediatric Nephrology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 5 - Paediatric Critical Care

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 31 Aug 2009
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 25 Sep 2009
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 04 Apr 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2011
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 18 Nov 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2012
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 May 2013