Pena Fernandez, Elena (CPSO#: 87311)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jan 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Restricted as of 01 Jan 2012

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, Italian, Spanish

Education:University of Madrid, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone: (613) 722 7000 Ext. 10995
Electoral District: 07
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Elena Pena-Fernandez Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Mar 26 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. E. Pena Fernandez ( CPSO# 87311 )

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital General Campus
Department of Medical Imaging
501 Smyth Road
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L6
Phone Number: (613) 421-9983

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
Civic Campus
1053 Carling Avenue
Ottawa ON  K1Y 4E9

Business Address:
The Ottawa Hospital
1967 Riverside Drive
Ottawa ON  K1H 7W9

Business Address:
Winchester District Memorial Hospital
566 Louise Street
Winchester ON  K0C 2K0

Business Address:
Renfrew Victoria Hospital
499 Raglan Street North
Renfrew ON  K7V 1P6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Almonte General Hospital Almonte
Arnprior and District Memorial Hospital Arnprior
Ottawa Hospital,Civic Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,General Site Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital,Riverside Site Ottawa
Renfrew Victoria Hospital Renfrew
St Francis Memorial Hospital Barrys Bay
University of Ottawa,Heart Institute Ottawa
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Diagnostic Radiology Effective: 01 Jan 2012 CPSO Recognized Specialist

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Ottawa, 05 Jul 2007 to 04 Aug 2007
PEAP - Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 05 Aug 2007 to 30 May 2008
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 08 Mar 2010 to 30 Jun 2010
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

University of Ottawa, 01 Jul 2011 to 31 Dec 2011
Clinical Fellow - Diagnostic Radiology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 05 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 05 Aug 2007
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 May 2008
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Mar 2010
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2011
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2012
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 20 May 2014
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Jan 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2018
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration Expiry Date: 31 Dec 2018

Practice Restrictions

Imposed By Effective Date Expiry Date Status  
Registration Committee Effective: 03 Aug 2017 Active View Details [+]
            Dr.  Elena  Pena  Fernandez  may  practise  medicine independenty in diagnostic
            radiology.