Perera, Ransri Francis (CPSO#: 86428)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 11 Mar 2010

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:Queen's University, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Trenton Memorial Hospital
Emergency Medicine Department
242 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6
Phone: (613) 392-2541
Electoral District: 06
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ransri Francis Perera Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Apr 19 2012

Shareholders:
Dr. R. Perera ( CPSO# 86428 )

Business Address:
241 King Street
Trenton ON  K8V 5S6

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Campbellford Memorial Hospital Campbellford
Chatham Public General Hospital Society Chatham
Dryden Regional Health Centre Dryden
Grey Bruce Health Services,Owen Sound Owen Sound
Grey Bruce Health Services,Southampton Hospital Southampton
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
La Verendrye Hospital,Riverside Health Care Facilities Fort Frances
Lake of the Woods District Hospital Kenora
Lennox and Addington County General Hospital Napanee
Niagara Health System,Welland County General Site Welland
Northumberland Hills Hospital,Cobourg District General Site Cobourg
Pembroke Regional Hospital Pembroke
Perth and Smiths Falls District Hospital,Smiths Falls Community Site Smiths Falls
Quinte Health Care,Trenton Memorial Trenton
Quinte Healthcare North Hastings,Bancroft Bancroft
Quinte Healthcare,Belleville General Site Belleville
St Joseph's General Hospital,Elliot Lake Elliot Lake
Strathroy Middlesex General Hospital Strathroy
Temiskaming Hospital New Liskeard
West Nipissing General Hospital Sturgeon Falls

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 19 Jun 2009 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. RANSRI FRANCIS PERERA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERERA is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2007 to 30 Jun 2008
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2008 to 30 Jun 2009
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Queen's University, 01 Jul 2009 to 30 Jun 2010
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2007
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Mar 2010