Perreault, Christine Mary (CPSO#: 64082)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 1991

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 19 May 1993

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1988

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Jeanne Mance Building
200 Eglantine Driveway
Ottawa ON  K1A 0X9
Phone: 613-793-6259
Electoral District: 07
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

CHEO
401 Smythe Road
Ottawa, Ontario
KiH 8L1
Ottawa ON  K1H 8L1
Canada
Phone: 6137377600
County: Regional Municipality of Ottawa-Carleton
Electoral District: 07

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

British Columbia

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Pediatrics Effective: 25 Nov 1992 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. CHRISTINE MARY PERREAULT may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERREAULT is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Clinical Fellow - Pediatrics

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1991
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 1993