Perry, Jowan Mohammed Rasheed (CPSO#: 76342)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2001

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 26 Jun 2003

Indicates a concern or additional information

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Arabic, English, Kurdi, Turkish

Education:University of Al-Mustansiriyah, 1985

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
2125 Front Road
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Phone: (519) 734-1234
Fax: (519) 734-8674
Electoral District: 01
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jowan Perry Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 15 2008

Shareholders:
Dr. J. Perry ( CPSO# 76342 )

Business Address:
2125 Front Road
La Salle ON  N9J 2C1
Phone Number: (519) 734-1234

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 17 Jun 2003 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. JOWAN MOHAMMED RASHEED PERRY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PERRY is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2001
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Jun 2003

Concerns

Source: ICR Committee
Active Date: October 14, 2016
Expiry Date:
Summary:
Caution-in-Person:

A summary of a decision of the Inquiries, Complaints and Reports Committee in which the disposition includes a "caution-in-person" is required by the College by-laws to be posted on the register, along with a note if the decision has been appealed. A “caution-in-person” disposition requires the physician to attend at the College and be verbally cautioned by a panel of the Committee. The summary will be removed from the register if the decision is overturned on appeal or review. Note that this requirement only applies to decisions arising out of a complaint dated on or after January 1, 2015 or if there was no complaint, the first appointment of investigators dated on or after January 1, 2015.

See PDF for the summary of a decision made against this member in which the disposition includes a caution-in-person.
Download Full Document (PDF)