Peterson, Mark David (CPSO#: 72684)

Current Status: Active Member as of 08 Jun 2007

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 08 Jun 2007

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:The University of Manitoba, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Michaels Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
8th Floor
30 Bond Street
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone: (416) 864-3086
Fax: (416) 864-6096
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mark D. Peterson Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Jan 21 2011

Shareholders:
Dr. M. Peterson ( CPSO# 72684 )
Dr. M. Chidambaram ( CPSO# 73900 )

Business Address:
St Michael's Hospital
Division of Cardiac Surgery
30 Bond Street 8th Floor
Room 8-003h
Toronto ON  M5B 1W8
Phone Number: (415) 864-3086

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
St Michael's Hospital Toronto
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Cardiac Surgery Effective: 31 Dec 2006 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. MARK DAVID PETERSON may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETERSON is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2003 to 30 Jun 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2004 to 30 Dec 2004
PostGrad Yr 4 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Clinician Investigator

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2005 to 31 Dec 2005
PostGrad Yr 5 - Cardiac Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2006 to 31 Dec 2006
PostGrad Yr 6 - Cardiac Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 31 Dec 2006
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 08 Jun 2007