Petrisor, Bradley Allan (CPSO#: 72335)

Current Status: Active Member as of 02 Dec 2003

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 02 Dec 2003

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Department of Surgery
Hamilton General Hospital
1280 Main Street West
5 North - Room 529
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone: (905) 527-4322 Ext. 44648
Fax: (905) 523-6776
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: B.A. Petrisor Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Feb 23 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. B. Petrisor ( CPSO# 72335 )

Business Address:
237 Barton Street East
Hamilton ON  L8L 2X2
Phone Number: (905) 521-2100

Business Address:
Department of Surgery
Hamilton General Hospital
5N-529 - 1280 Main Street West
Hamilton ON  L8S 4K1
Phone Number: (905) 527-4322

Medical Licences in Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.

Uganda

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Hamilton Health Sciences,General Site Hamilton
St Joseph's Healthcare System,Hamilton Hamilton

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Orthopedic Surgery Effective: 30 Jun 2003 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. BRADLEY ALLAN PETRISOR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PETRISOR is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1998 to 30 Jun 1999
PostGrad Yr 1 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 1999 to 30 Jun 2000
PostGrad Yr 2 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2000 to 30 Jun 2001
PostGrad Yr 3 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2001 to 30 Jun 2002
PostGrad Yr 4 - Orthopedic Surgery

McMaster University, 01 Jul 2002 to 30 Jun 2003
PostGrad Yr 5 - Orthopedic Surgery

University of Toronto, 01 Jan 2005 to 30 Jun 2005
Clinical Fellow - Orthopedic Surgery

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 1998
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 2003
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Dec 2003