Petrocci, Michael Charles (CPSO#: 56288)

Current Status: Expired: Resigned from membership as of 18 Jul 2018

CPSO Registration Class: None as of 18 Jul 2018

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English, French

Education:McGill University, 1982

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
St Catharines General
1200 4th Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2R 7C6
Phone: (905) 684-7271 Ext. 5461
Electoral District: 04
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Michael Petrocci & Valerie Jaeger Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Sep 26 2006

Shareholders:
Dr. V. Jaeger ( CPSO# 56287 )
Dr. M. Petrocci ( CPSO# 56288 )

Business Address:
1200 Fourth Avenue
St Catharines ON  L2S 0A9
Phone Number: (905) 378-4647

Business Address:
Niagara Regional Public Health Unit
2201 St David's Road West
P.O. Box 1042
Thorold ON  L2V 4T7
Phone Number: (905) 685-1571

Medical Records Location

Address: Niagra Health System 1200 4th Ave St. Catherines ON L2S 0A9
Date Received: 12 Jul 2018

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 01 Jul 1984 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 01 Nov 1989 CFPC Specialist

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 1985
Expired: Resigned from membership. Expiry: 18 Jul 2018