Phillips, David Douglas (CPSO#: 93099)

Current Status: Active Member as of 01 Jul 2010

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 03 Jan 2013

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Male

Languages Spoken: English

Education:University of Toronto, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Toronto East Health Network
Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Ave.
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone: (416) 461-8272
Electoral District: 10
View Professional Corporation Information

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. David D. Phillips Medicine Professional Corporation

Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date:  Dec 22 2014

Shareholders:
Dr. D. Phillips ( CPSO# 93099 )

Business Address:
The Scarborough Hospital
Emergency Department
3050 Lawrence Avenue East
Toronto ON  M1P 2V5
Phone Number: (416) 431-8181

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
Emergency Department
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Business Address:
Michael Garron Hospital
Palliative
825 Coxwell Avenue
Toronto ON  M4C 3E7
Phone Number: (416) 461-8272

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Michael Garron Hospital - Toronto East Health Network Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Family Medicine Effective: 11 Dec 2012 CFPC Specialist
Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine) Effective: 20 Nov 2014 CFPC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DAVID DOUGLAS PHILLIPS may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PHILLIPS is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2010 to 30 Jun 2011
PostGrad Yr 1 - Family Medicine

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 2011 to 30 Jun 2012
PostGrad Yr 2 - Family Medicine

The University of Western Ontario, 01 Jul 2012 to 30 Jun 2013
PostGrad Yr 3 - Family Medicine (Emergency Medicine)

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2010
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Jan 2013