Pilavdzic, Dragana (CPSO#: 63085)

Current Status: Active Member as of 24 Oct 2012

CPSO Registration Class: Independent Practice as of 24 Oct 2012

Summary

Former Name: No Former Name

Gender: Female

Languages Spoken: Bosnian, Croatian, English, French, Serbian

Education:University of Zagreb, 1980

Practice Information

Primary Location of Practice
Lakeridge Health
1 Hospital Court
Oshawa ON  L1G 2B9
Phone: (905) 576-8711 Ext. 2527
Fax: (905) 721-4757
Electoral District: 05
View more practice locations

Additional Practice Location(s)

1100 Bennett Street
Bowmanville ON  L1C 3K9
Canada
Phone: (905) 679-4711 Ext. 5668
County: Regional Municipality of Durham
Electoral District: 05

Hospital Privileges

Hospital Location
Lakeridge Health,Oshawa General Site Oshawa
University Health Network,Toronto General Hospital Site Toronto

Specialties

Specialty Issued On Type
Anatomical Pathology Effective: 07 Jun 1995 RCPSC Specialist

Terms and Conditions

Details

(1) Dr. DRAGANA PILAVDZIC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. PILAVDZIC is educated and experienced.

Postgraduate Training

Please note: This information may not be a complete record of postgraduate training.

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1990 to 30 Jun 1991
Resident 1 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1991 to 30 Jun 1992
Resident 2 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1992 to 30 Jun 1993
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1993 to 27 Jul 1993
Resident 3 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 28 Jul 1993 to 30 Jun 1994
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

University of Toronto, 01 Jul 1994 to 30 Jun 1995
Resident 4 - Anatomical Pathology

Registration History

Action Issue Date
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 28 Aug 1990
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Expiry: 30 Jun 1995
Subsequent certificate of registration Issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Oct 2012